US HB6013 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to modernize service-disabled veterans insurance.
Title
Veteran Families Financial Support Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4511 (Related) 2020-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Life, casualty, property insurance
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Life, casualty, property insurance
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6013/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6013/BILLS-116hr6013ih.pdf |