US HB6039 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to enter into an agreement with the city of Vallejo, California, for the transfer to the VA of Mare Island Naval Cemetery in Vallejo, California, to be maintained as a national shrine.
Title
To require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to seek to enter into an agreement with the city of Vallejo, California, for the transfer of Mare Island Naval Cemetery in Vallejo, California, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB578 (Related) 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB127 (Related) 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S226)
SB2983 (Same As) 2019-12-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB127 (Related) 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S226)
SB2983 (Same As) 2019-12-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
California
Cemeteries and funerals
Congressional oversight
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
California
Cemeteries and funerals
Congressional oversight
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6039/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6039/BILLS-116hr6039ih.pdf |