US HB6067 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all livestock purchased by a dealer in cash sales and all inventories of, or receivables or proceeds from, such livestock to be held by the dealer in a trust until all unpaid cash sellers of the livestock have been paid. The bill exempts from the requirement any dealer whose average annual purchases of livestock do not exceed $100,000. The bill also specifies requirements regarding enforcement, preserving a trust, notifying lien holders, and purchasing or transferring livestock that is subject to a trust.
Title
SALE Act of 2020 Securing All Livestock Equitably Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. James Comer [R-KY] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] |
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2020-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3419 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Agriculture and food
Civil actions and liability
Department of Agriculture
Federal district courts
Livestock
Agriculture and food
Civil actions and liability
Department of Agriculture
Federal district courts
Livestock
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6067/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6067/BILLS-116hr6067ih.pdf |