US HB6078 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to the Small Business Administration's (SBA) disbursement of certain financial assistance. Specifically, the bill establishes a 5% technical assistance grant for certain intermediaries, including intermediaries who make 25% of their loans to rural small businesses. Further, the bill requires the SBA to report certain metrics related to the disbursement of microloans to small businesses, including (1) the number, amount, and percentage of such loans that went into default in the previous year; (2) the extent to which microloans are provided to small businesses in rural areas; and (3) the average size, rate of interest, and amount of fees charged for each microloan.
Title
Microloan Transparency and Accountability Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2020-09-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4347) |
2020-09-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6078. |
2020-09-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4347-4348) |
2020-09-14 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2020-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Rural conditions and development
Small Business Administration
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Rural conditions and development
Small Business Administration