US HB6112 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require operators of oil and gas production facilities to take certain measures to protect drinking water, and for other purposes.
Title
Oil and Water Don’t Mix Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB436 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB585 (Related) 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
HB4006 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
HB4007 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB4014 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
HB585 (Related) 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
HB4006 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
HB4007 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB4014 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Business records
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian lands and resources rights
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Oil and gas
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water use and supply
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Business records
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian lands and resources rights
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Oil and gas
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6112/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6112/BILLS-116hr6112ih.pdf |