US HB6125 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretaries of Defense and Veterans Affairs to coordinate support for survivors of sexual trauma.
Title
Supporting Survivors of Military Sexual Trauma Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Health information and medical records
Intergovernmental relations
Military medicine
Sex offenses
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Health information and medical records
Intergovernmental relations
Military medicine
Sex offenses
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6125/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6125/BILLS-116hr6125ih.pdf |