US HB6131 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Architect of the Capitol to replace the bust of Roger Brooke Taney in the Old Supreme Court Chamber of the United States Capitol with a bust of Thurgood Marshall to be obtained by the Joint Committee on the Library, and for other purposes.
Title
To direct the Architect of the Capitol to replace the bust of Roger Brooke Taney in the Old Supreme Court Chamber of the United States Capitol with a bust of Thurgood Marshall to be obtained by the Joint Committee on the Library, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3863 (Same As) 2020-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB7573 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Received in the Senate.
SB4382 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB7573 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Received in the Senate.
SB4382 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6131/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6131/BILLS-116hr6131ih.pdf |