US HB6141 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Strategic Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Strategic Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Energy to develop a report on a pilot program to site, construct, and operate micro-reactors at critical national security locations, and for other purposes.
Title
To require the Secretary of Energy to develop a report on a pilot program to site, construct, and operate micro-reactors at critical national security locations, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces. |
2018-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2018-06-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6141/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6141/BILLS-115hr6141ih.pdf |