US HB6141 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an appropriation to the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) for FY2022 to improve maternity care coordination for women veterans throughout pregnancy and the one-year postpartum period. The VA must submit a plan to improve maternity care coordination to fulfill the responsibilities and requirements in the Veterans Health Administration Handbook 1330.03 (or successor handbook). The bill requires the Government Accountability Office to report on maternal mortality and severe maternal morbidity among women veterans, with a focus on racial and ethnic disparities in maternal health outcomes.
Title
Protecting Moms Who Served Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3424 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6142 (Related) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6142 (Related) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Employee hiring
Government information and archives
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Intergovernmental relations
Medicaid
Mental health
Minority employment
Minority health
Sex offenses
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Women's employment
Women's health
Congressional oversight
Employee hiring
Government information and archives
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Intergovernmental relations
Medicaid
Mental health
Minority employment
Minority health
Sex offenses
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Women's employment
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6141/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6141/BILLS-116hr6141ih.pdf |