US HB615 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State, when providing overseas assistance for refugees, to ensure the provision of safe and secure access to sanitation facilities, with a special emphasis on women, girls, and vulnerable populations.
Title
Refugee Sanitation Facility Safety Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-05-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3970) |
2019-05-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 615. |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3970) |
2019-05-20 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Solid waste and recycling
Women's health
Child safety and welfare
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Solid waste and recycling
Women's health