US HB6150 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 84-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Paid Sick Days for Public Health Emergencies and Personal and Family Care Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paid Sick Days for Public Health Emergencies and Personal and Family Care Act

Sponsors

Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1784 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6201 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Engrossment Correction
SB840 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3415 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3513 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6442 (Related) 2020-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback