US HB6160 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends by a year and one half the Department of Homeland Security's Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program.
Title
To extend the chemical facility anti-terrorism standards program of the Department of Homeland Security.
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2020-03-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-14 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H1692) |
2020-03-14 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1692) |
2020-03-14 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2020-03-14 | House | Committee on Homeland Security discharged. |
2020-03-14 | House | Mr. Thompson (MS) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2020-03-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB251 (Related) 2019-01-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-2. (TXT | PDF)
SB4148 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-150. (TXT | PDF)
SB4096 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4197 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4148 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-150. (TXT | PDF)
SB4096 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4197 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Industrial facilities
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Terrorism
Civil actions and liability
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Industrial facilities
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Terrorism