US HB6189 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 112-189.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 112-189.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reporting Efficiency Improvement Act - Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to repeal a requirement that the Attorney General submit a report to Congress on grants to state and local governments for a program or project to develop or improve the capability to analyze deoxyribonucleic acid (DNA). Amends the Police Corps Act to repeal the requirement for the Director of the Office of the Police Corps and Law Enforcement Education to submit an annual report on the Police Corps program.
Title
Reporting Efficiency Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-05 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-189. |
2012-10-05 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-09-24 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-09-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-09-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6674) |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2012-09-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-09-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5796) |
2012-09-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6189. |
2012-09-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5796) |
2012-09-11 | House | Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-09-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 466. |
2012-09-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-648. |
2012-08-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2012-08-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Genetics
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Genetics
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding