US HB6198 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish in the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) a Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Office, headed by an Assistant Secretary. The Assistant Secretary shall serve as the principal advisor to DHS on weapons of mass destruction matters and strategies, and on coordinating efforts to counter weapons of mass destruction. The office shall coordinate DHS strategy and policy to plan, detect, and protect against the importation, possession, storage, transportation, development, or use of unauthorized chemical, biological, radiological, or nuclear materials, devices, or agents. The Assistant Secretary shall establish the Securing the Cities program to detect and prevent terrorist attacks and other high consequence events utilizing nuclear or other radiological materials that pose a high risk to homeland security in high-risk urban areas. The bill establishes in the office a Chief Medical Officer who shall serve as the principal advisor to DHS on medical and public health issues. The DHS Under Secretary for Management shall be responsible for workforce-focused health and medical activities of DHS. DHS shall: (1) transfer to the office all personnel, budget authority, and assets of the Domestic Nuclear Detection Office and the Office of Health Affairs; and (2) provide a briefing and report to Congress on DHS chemical, biological, radiological, and nuclear activities.
Title
Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8113-8115) |
2018-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6198. |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8113-8117) |
2018-09-12 | House | Mr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 716. |
2018-09-07 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2018-09-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-923, Part I. |
2018-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-24 | House | Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications Discharged. |
2018-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications. |
2018-06-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB655 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2825 (Related) 2018-11-13 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-351.
HB7213 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
HB2825 (Related) 2018-11-13 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-351.
HB7213 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Subjects
Chemical and biological weapons
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Health personnel
Intergovernmental relations
Nuclear weapons
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Health personnel
Intergovernmental relations
Nuclear weapons
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development