US HB620 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reserve Retirement Deployment Credit Correction Act revises the calculation of age of eligibility for retired pay for members of the Ready Reserve so that days of active duty or active service after October 7, 2001, (the start of combat operations in Afghanistan) reduce a member's age of eligibility. Currently, active duty or active service days after January 28, 2008, reduce a member's age of eligibility. The bill is retroactive to October 7, 2001.
Title
Reserve Retirement Deployment Credit Correction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Conflicts and wars
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/620/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr620/BILLS-116hr620ih.pdf |