US HB6273 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the Medicaid Federal Medical Assistance Percentage (FMAP) for all states and U.S. territories during the public health emergency declared on January 31, 2020, relating to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019), in accordance with specified conditions. For example, in order to receive the increased FMAP, a state Medicaid program may not require standards for eligibility that are more restrictive than the standards that were in effect on January 1, 2020. The bill also increases Medicaid funding for U.S. territories for FY2020-FY2021.
Title
Protecting Vulnerable Americans in Times of Crisis Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6201 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Engrossment Correction
HR904 (Related) 2020-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR904 (Related) 2020-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
American Samoa
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Guam
Health
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Medicaid
Northern Mariana Islands
Puerto Rico
State and local finance
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Guam
Health
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Medicaid
Northern Mariana Islands
Puerto Rico
State and local finance
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6273/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6273/BILLS-116hr6273ih.pdf |