US HB6283 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Good Samaritan Health Professionals Act of 2020 This bill extends liability protection for harm caused by acts or omissions by volunteer health care professionals in the course of providing certain health care services during specified public-health or national emergencies or major disasters. However, such liability protection shall not apply if (1) the harm was caused by willful or criminal misconduct, gross negligence, reckless misconduct, or a conscious flagrant indifference to the rights or safety of the individual harmed; or (2) the health care professional provided services under the influence of alcohol or an intoxicating drug.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Good Samaritan Health Professionals Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB1350 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback