US HB6299 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Shortens the time frame under which private health insurance plans must cover certain new preventative services related to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Under current law, health plans have one year to cover services recommended by the United States Preventive Services Task Force or the Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices. Under this bill, health plans must cover such services to prevent or diagnose COVID-19 within 15 days.
Title
Rapid Coverage of COVID-19 Vaccine Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-03-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3505 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3505 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6299/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6299/BILLS-116hr6299ih.pdf |