US HB630 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State to report biennially on U.S. initiatives to build capacity in foreign countries to prevent travel by terrorists and foreign fighters, and accelerates programs to share equipment with countries to prevent such travel. The report shall include (1) an assessment of the countries of greatest concern, (2) data such as the number of flights from such countries to the United States, (3) information on existing U.S. programs to build capacity to prevent travel by terrorists in those countries, and (4) a plan for prioritizing U.S. resources toward the countries of greatest concern. The Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall accelerate provisions to foreign governments of (1) U.S. Customs and Border Protection's global travel targeting and analysis systems and (2) the State Department's watch-listing, identification, and screening systems. DHS may provide equipment, training, and maintenance services related to such systems. DHS shall notify Congress when it provides such equipment to a foreign government, along with information such as the specific risk that will be mitigated by the system and the total dollar value of the equipment provided. The bill directs the State Department to report to Congress each year on countries that fail to meet minimum standards to combat terrorist and foreign fighter travel. The State Department is authorized to suspend certain foreign assistance to countries that do not make significant efforts to meet such standards.
Title
Counterterrorism Screening and Assistance Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Customs enforcement
Emergency planning and evacuation
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Homeland security
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intellectual property
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Natural disasters
Sanctions
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
World health
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Customs enforcement
Emergency planning and evacuation
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Homeland security
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intellectual property
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Natural disasters
Sanctions
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/630/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr630/BILLS-116hr630ih.pdf |