US HB6304 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Small Business Administration (SBA) to pay the principal, interest, and any associated fees owed on certain loans made to small businesses for a six month period. The SBA must also encourage the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, and state bank regulators to not require lenders to increase their reserves on account of receiving such payments made by the SBA. The SBA shall waive statutory limits on maximum loan maturities for certain loan durations where the lender provides a deferral and extends the maturity of such loans and, when necessary to provide more time because of difficulties during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic, extend lender site visit requirements.
Title
Small Business Repayment Relief Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2020-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6312 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB3519 (Related) 2020-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB6396 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6312 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB3519 (Related) 2020-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB6396 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business investment and capital
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Credit and credit markets
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Women in business
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business investment and capital
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Credit and credit markets
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Women in business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6304/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6304/BILLS-116hr6304ih.pdf |