US HB6316 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Advocacy Improvements Act of 2018
Title
Small Business Advocacy Improvements Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. James Comer [R-KY] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8804) |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6316. |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8804-8805) |
2018-09-25 | House | Mr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-09-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 729. |
2018-09-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-938. |
2018-07-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported. |
2018-07-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2018-07-06 | House | Introduced in House |