US HB6322 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-28 - Became Public Law No: 116-140. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Student Veteran Coronavirus Response Act of 2020 This bill addresses education programs and assistance for veterans during the covered period from March 1-December 21, 2020. Specifically, the bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to continue paying work-study allowances during emergency periods. The VA is also authorized to continue paying educational assistance and subsistence allowances for a specified amount of time for programs of education that are suspended due to an emergency situation. An educational assistance payment shall not be charged against an individual's entitlement to educational assistance if an individual was unable to complete a course or program due to the temporary closure of an educational institution or the temporary termination of a program by reason of an emergency situation. This includes assistance related to training and rehabilitation programs for veterans with service-connected disabilities. The bill extends the time limitation for using educational assistance under the Montgomery GI Bill and the Post-9/11 GI Bill when institutions are closed due to an emergency situation or executive order. The bill also extends the time limitation for participation in a vocational rehabilitation program when such participation is prevented due to an emergency situation or executive order. The bill authorizes the VA to pay a subsistence allowance for two additional months to a veteran following a program of employment services during the covered period for full-time training for the type of program the veteran was pursuing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Veteran Coronavirus Response Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-28SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-140. (TXT | PDF)
2020-04-28SenateSigned by President.
2020-04-23SenatePresented to President.
2020-04-22SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-04-21SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2187; text: CR S2187)
2020-04-21SenateReceived in the Senate under the order of 4/21/2020.
2020-03-31HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-03-31HouseOn passage, as amended Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1869-1870)
2020-03-31HouseCommittee on Armed Services discharged.
2020-03-31HouseCommittee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
2020-03-31HouseWithout objection, the Chair laid before the House H.R. 6322 with an amendment. The reading of the amendment was dispensed with and the amendment was agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H1868-1870)
2020-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-03-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6262 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3575 (Related) 2020-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB3678 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback