US HB6341 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Small Business Administration (SBA) to carry out a temporary program to guarantee loans made by banks or other lenders to small businesses affected by COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Such loans shall be zero-interest, fee-free loans, and up to 50% of the principal on such loans shall be forgiven if a recipient demonstrates that its employment has not decreased between December 31, 2019, and December 31, 2021. In addition to permitted uses of SBA loans, such guaranteed loans may also be used for purposes such as providing employees of the borrower with (1) benefits and wages, (2) technology for shifting to telework or remote work, or (3) necessary items specified by a public health authority to mitigate the spread of COVID-19.
Title
Small Business Relief Guaranteed Loan Program Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2020-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6268 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB6312 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB6312 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment taxes
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Sales and excise taxes
Small business
Small Business Administration
State and local taxation
Wages and earnings
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment taxes
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Sales and excise taxes
Small business
Small Business Administration
State and local taxation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6341/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6341/BILLS-116hr6341ih.pdf |