US HB6368 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging Small Business Innovators
Title
Encouraging Small Business Innovators
Sponsors
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-25 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 400 (Y: 389 N: 6 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 6 (Roll no. 400). (text: CR H8808) |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8820-8821) |
2018-09-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Chabot objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House resumed with debate on H.R. 6368. |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6368. |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8808-8810) |
2018-09-25 | House | Mr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 744. |
2018-09-20 | House | Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged. |
2018-09-20 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-09-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-956, Part I. |
2018-07-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported. |
2018-07-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.