US HB640 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-17 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-17 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) to disclose certain tax return information to the Department of Education (ED) for the purpose of administering financial aid and loan programs under the Higher Education Act of 1965. (Under current law, students must obtain their own tax return information from the IRS and submit it to ED.) Upon receiving a request from ED, the IRS must disclose specified tax return information to ED for the purposes of establishing, renewing, administering, and conducting analyses and forecasts for estimating costs related to income-contingent or income-based repayment programs; the discharge of loans based on a total and permanent disability; determining the eligibility for, and the amount of, federal student financial aid; and conducting analyses and forecasts for estimating costs related to federal student financial aid programs. ED may only use the disclosed information for the purposes above and for mitigating risks related to the programs. Mitigating risks includes activities related to analyzing or estimating costs, conducting oversight, developing statistics, and reducing improper payments. It does not include conducting criminal investigations or prosecutions. With the consent of the taxpayer, ED may disclose the return information to certain institutions of higher education, state higher education agencies, and scholarship organizations solely for the use in financial aid programs. The bill also specifies notification and reporting requirements related to the disclosures and the implementation of this bill.
Title
Student Aid Simplification Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1346 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2486 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
HB2065 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HR891 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1002 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2486 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
HB2065 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HR891 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1002 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Disability assistance
Education programs funding
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Income tax credits
Poverty and welfare assistance
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Wages and earnings
Disability assistance
Education programs funding
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Income tax credits
Poverty and welfare assistance
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/640/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr640/BILLS-116hr640ih.pdf |