US HB6400 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Emergency Community Supervision Act This bill establishes measures to reduce the number of individuals in federal custody during a national emergency relating to a communicable disease. Specifically, it does the following: requires certain categories of inmates to be released and placed in community supervision (e.g., home confinement); limits the use of pretrial detention; and modifies supervised release, including to limit the use of incarceration as a sanction for a parole violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Community Supervision Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2020-03-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3579 (Same As) 2020-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3646 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback