US HB6414 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Became Public Law No: 115-235. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Became Public Law No: 115-235. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 23, United States Code, to extend the deadline for promulgation of regulations under the tribal transportation self-governance program. This bill extends: (1) from 21 to 42 months after the enactment of the Fixing America's Surface Transportation Act or the FAST Act (i.e. December 4, 2015), the authority to publish proposed regulations in the Federal Register to carry out the tribal transportation self-governance program; and (2) from 30 to 48 months after such date, the authority to promulgate regulations for such program.
Title
To amend title 23, United States Code, to extend the deadline for promulgation of regulations under the tribal transportation self-governance program.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-235. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-08-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5560) |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7639) |
2018-07-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6414. |
2018-07-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7639-7640) |
2018-07-25 | House | Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-07-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2018-07-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-07-18 | House | Introduced in House |