US HB642 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through the end of FY2026 the Oil Region National Heritage Area Act.
Title
Oil Region National Heritage Area Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-23 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1001) |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1265 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/642/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr642/BILLS-116hr642ih.pdf |