US HB6431 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes in the legislative branch a National Commission on United States Preparedness for National Emergencies. Not later than 18 months after this bill's enactment, the commission shall report to the President and Congress regarding (1) which medical, pharmaceutical, and emergency preparedness products are determined to be essential; and (2) actions states should take to be better prepared, national federal stockpile requirements, and national surge capacity infrastructure deficiencies in hospitals and medical centers. States that fail to implement the findings of the commission's report by January 1, 2025, at the state and local level, will lose access to all federal funds for emergency preparedness unless the Department of Homeland Security exempts a state determined to be working to implement such findings in good faith. The bill (1) requires certain medical, pharmaceutical, and emergency preparedness products integral to the response to a national emergency to be manufactured and procured within the United States; and (2) provides for a temporary 100% expensing for firms that incur costs associated with pharmaceutical or medical device manufacturing within the United States, including personal protective equipment and other necessary items.
Title
Made in America Emergency Preparedness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] |
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery. |
2020-04-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Business expenses
Buy American requirements
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government operations and politics
Health facilities and institutions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Income tax deductions
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Manufacturing
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Prescription drugs
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
State and local government operations
Strategic materials and reserves
War and emergency powers
Business expenses
Buy American requirements
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government operations and politics
Health facilities and institutions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Income tax deductions
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Manufacturing
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Prescription drugs
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
State and local government operations
Strategic materials and reserves
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6431/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6431/BILLS-116hr6431ih.pdf |