US HB6447 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Temporarily increases the maximum percentage that certain federal regional commissions may contribute toward infrastructure projects in distressed counties (i.e., counties that are the most economically distressed and underdeveloped and have high rates of poverty, unemployment, or outmigration). Specifically, for grants awarded between January 1, 2019-December 31, 2021, the bill allows the Southeast Crescent Regional Commission, the Southwest Border Regional Commission, and the Northern Border Regional Commission (NBRC) to contribute 100% of costs for projects in distressed counties. (Currently, only the NBRC is active.)
Title
Northern Border Regional Commission Financial Flexibility Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Economic development
Government operations and politics
Infrastructure development
Regional and metropolitan planning
Rural conditions and development
State and local finance
Government operations and politics
Infrastructure development
Regional and metropolitan planning
Rural conditions and development
State and local finance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6447/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6447/BILLS-116hr6447ih.pdf |