US HB6509 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to provide public safety officer death and disability benefits for certain public safety officers who contract COVID-19, and for other purposes.
Title
Public Safety Officer Pandemic Response Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-05-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-05-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2316) |
2020-05-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6509. |
2020-05-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2316-2319) |
2020-05-27 | House | Mr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Cancer
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Crime and law enforcement
Disability and paralysis
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Terrorism
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Crime and law enforcement
Disability and paralysis
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Terrorism