US HB6543 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 87-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Aim Higher Act
Title
Aim Higher Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2018-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2270 (Related) 2017-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB2845 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB2859 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB2949 (Related) 2017-06-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB2960 (Related) 2017-06-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB2961 (Related) 2017-06-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB3199 (Related) 2017-07-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB3740 (Related) 2017-09-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB3742 (Related) 2017-09-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB4491 (Related) 2017-11-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB5312 (Related) 2018-03-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB5767 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB6535 (Related) 2018-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB1125 (Related) 2017-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2934)
SB1135 (Related) 2017-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1384 (Related) 2017-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1413 (Related) 2017-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1792 (Related) 2017-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2483 (Related) 2018-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6862 (Related) 2018-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB3509 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-268. (TXT | PDF)
SB3783 (Related) 2018-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2845 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB2859 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB2949 (Related) 2017-06-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB2960 (Related) 2017-06-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB2961 (Related) 2017-06-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB3199 (Related) 2017-07-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB3740 (Related) 2017-09-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB3742 (Related) 2017-09-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB4491 (Related) 2017-11-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB5312 (Related) 2018-03-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB5767 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB6535 (Related) 2018-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB1125 (Related) 2017-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2934)
SB1135 (Related) 2017-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1384 (Related) 2017-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1413 (Related) 2017-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1792 (Related) 2017-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2483 (Related) 2018-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6862 (Related) 2018-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB3509 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-268. (TXT | PDF)
SB3783 (Related) 2018-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6543/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6543/BILLS-115hr6543ih.pdf |