US HB6545 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 182-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Violence Against Women Reauthorization Act of 2018
Title
Violence Against Women Reauthorization Act of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-08-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2018-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3207 (Related) 2017-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB3410 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4343 (Related) 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4485 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB1539 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
SB1942 (Related) 2018-12-10 - Held at the desk.
HB3410 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4343 (Related) 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4485 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB1539 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
SB1942 (Related) 2018-12-10 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Aging
Assault and harassment offenses
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Firearms and explosives
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Housing and community development funding
Housing discrimination
Human trafficking
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Low- and moderate-income housing
Marriage and family status
Medical education
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public housing
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Sex offenses
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Telephone and wireless communication
Unemployment
Violent crime
Vocational and technical education
Women's employment
Women's health
Assault and harassment offenses
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Firearms and explosives
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Housing and community development funding
Housing discrimination
Human trafficking
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Low- and moderate-income housing
Marriage and family status
Medical education
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public housing
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Sex offenses
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Telephone and wireless communication
Unemployment
Violent crime
Vocational and technical education
Women's employment
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6545/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6545/BILLS-115hr6545ih.pdf |