US HB6546 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture, for National Forest System lands, and the Department of the Interior, for public lands, by May 31, 2020, to jointly submit to Congress a report on their activities to mitigate wildfire risk during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic, including activities to minimize the impact of wildfires on the respiratory health of communities; identify methods of fuels reduction used during the COVID-19 pandemic to minimize the threat of wildfire on such lands; and slow the spread of COVID-19 between firefighters and emergency response teams. Such report shall also include the recommendations of the departments with respect to the federal support necessary to carry out these activities. Not later than December 31, 2020, such departments shall jointly submit to Congress a report on (1) the activities and recommendations, and (2) the outcomes of forest and wildfire management in response to the COVID-19 pandemic and the recommendations of the departments with respect to such outcomes.
Title
Wildfire and Community Health Response Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-04-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Forests, forestry, trees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Forests, forestry, trees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6546/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6546/BILLS-116hr6546ih.pdf |