US HB6559 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 114-4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-21 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19 Every Worker Protection Act of 2020 This bill requires the Department of Labor to promulgate both an emergency temporary occupational safety or health standard and a permanent standard to protect certain employees from occupational exposure to the coronavirus (i.e., the virus that causes COVID-19). These standards apply to health care sector employees, paramedic and emergency medical services employees, and other employees identified as having an elevated risk for exposure. Further, the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention must collect and make public information regarding employee exposure in these occupations and provide guidance to further protect such employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 Every Worker Protection Act of 2020

Sponsors

Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]
Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-04-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-04-21HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6800 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 455.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3677 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback