US HB6560 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Responds to the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) public health emergency by increasing volunteer opportunities within AmeriCorps and employment opportunities at the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA), and requiring the re-enrollment of Peace Corps volunteers whose service ended involuntarily on March 15, 2020, or earlier for volunteers who were serving in China and Mongolia. Among other things, the bill reauthorizes through FY2022 Americorps programs; increases recruitment levels of its volunteers to 500,000 in FY2020-FY2022; sets the minimum compensation for Americorps volunteers, beginning in FY2020, at 200% of the poverty line applicable to a family of one; and requires FEMA to appoint, administer, and expedite the training of an additional 10,000 Cadre of On-Call Response/Recovery Employees above the level of such employees in FY2019 to address the COVID-19 emergency.
Title
UNITE Act of 2020 Undertaking National Initiatives to Tackle Epidemic Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] |
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-04-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-04-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3642 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Aging
Asia
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
China
Congressional oversight
Corporation for National and Community Service
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Education of the disadvantaged
Educational technology and distance education
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employee hiring
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Food assistance and relief
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Labor and employment
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mongolia
National and community service
Natural disasters
Peace Corps
Public-private cooperation
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
World health
Asia
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
China
Congressional oversight
Corporation for National and Community Service
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Education of the disadvantaged
Educational technology and distance education
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employee hiring
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Food assistance and relief
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Labor and employment
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mongolia
National and community service
Natural disasters
Peace Corps
Public-private cooperation
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6560/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6560/BILLS-116hr6560ih.pdf |