US HB6590 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defers certain debts arising from benefits under laws administered by the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) during the covered period, which is the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) emergency period plus the 60 days following the end of such period. Specifically, the bill prohibits the VA from doing the following during the covered period: collecting or recording certain debts, issuing notice of certain debts to a person or consumer reporting agency, allowing any interest to accrue on certain debts, or applying any administrative fee to certain debts. The VA may collect a payment from a person who elects to make such payment during the covered period.
Title
To defer action regarding certain debts arising from benefits under laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for a period of time including the COVID-19 emergency period.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2020-04-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-04-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3887 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3887 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Consumer credit
Debt collection
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
User charges and fees
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Consumer credit
Debt collection
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
User charges and fees
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6590/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6590/BILLS-116hr6590ih.pdf |