US HB6613 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Markets and Trading Reorganization Act - Establishes the Securities and Derivatives Commission as an independent regulatory commission. Directs such Commission to establish three principal divisions: (1) a Markets and Trading Division with oversight of market conduct and utilities, the conduct of market professionals, and self-regulatory organizations with regard to such market professionals, including related examination functions; (2) an Issuers and Financial Disclosures Division with oversight of the issuance of securities, including investment companies and related rules and examinations; and (3) an Enforcement Division responsible for the enforcement of all Commission rules. Transfers to the Commission all functions and personnel of: (1) the Commodity Futures Trading Commission (CFTC), and (2) the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC). Grants the Commission fee and funding authority.
Title
Markets and Trading Reorganization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Barney Frank [D-MA] | Rep. Gary Ackerman [D-NY] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises. |
2012-12-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management. |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3665 (Related) 2012-01-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Subjects
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Executive agency funding and structure
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
User charges and fees
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Executive agency funding and structure
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/6613/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr6613/BILLS-112hr6613ih.pdf |