US HB663 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 132-63-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Burn Pits Accountability Act Burn Pits Accountability Act This bill requires the Department of Defense (DOD) and the military departments to evaluate whether each member of the Armed Forces has been (1) based or stationed where an open air burn pit was used to dispose of waste, or (2) exposed to toxic airborne chemicals. Members located where an open burn pit was used or exposed to toxic airborne chemicals must be enrolled in the Airborne Hazards and Open Burn Pit Registry, unless the member elects not to enroll. The evaluations must be included in periodic health assessments, physical exams conducted immediately prior to separation from active duty, and deployment assessments. DOD must share the results of the evaluations with the Department of Veterans Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Burn Pits Accountability Act

Sponsors

Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. George Holding [R-NC]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC]
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Steve King [R-IA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]
Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]
Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2019-01-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-17HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H704)
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB191 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-07-02 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback