US HB6636 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 464.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 464.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses sexual harassment and sexual assault involving personnel of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA). Specifically, the bill expands coverage of NOAA's sexual harassment prevention and response policy to include personnel such as observers and at-sea monitors, and voting members and executive and administrative staff of regional fishery management councils; directs NOAA to provide a mechanism for anonymous reports of sexual harassment to its Office of Inclusion and Civil Rights and sexual assault to its Workplace Violence Prevention and Response Program; requires NOAA to ensure that allegations of sexual assault and sexual harassment are investigated thoroughly and promptly; provides for a restricted reporting structure that allows survivors of sexual assault to receive services without triggering an investigative process; revises reporting requirements on sexual harassment, sexual assault, and equal opportunity employment; and removes the requirements that acts of assault, resistance, opposition, intimidation, sexual harassment, bribery, or interference with a fishery observer be forcible in nature and occur on a vessel to be unlawful.
Title
National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Sexual Harassment and Assault Prevention Improvements Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 464. |
2020-11-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-566. |
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-29 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2020-05-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2020-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2020-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2782 (Related) 2020-08-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 520.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Commerce
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Public lands and natural resources
Right of privacy
Sex offenses
Worker safety and health
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Commerce
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Public lands and natural resources
Right of privacy
Sex offenses
Worker safety and health