US HB6661 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Defense (DOD) to carry out a grant program to assist high schools in providing education to students in the Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps in subjects including science, technology, math, engineering, computer science, and related areas. Local educational agencies may use grant funds for purposes including training and other support for instructors, acquisition of instructional materials, travel opportunities, mentoring programs, and certifications for students. In making the grants, DOD must give preference to schools with high percentages of children from low-income families.
Title
PROMOTES Act of 2020 Providing Resources and Organization to Maximize Opportunities for Training and Education in STEM Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2020-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3266 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB2154 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB3900 (Same As) 2020-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2154 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB3900 (Same As) 2020-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Military education and training
Performance measurement
Science and engineering education
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Military education and training
Performance measurement
Science and engineering education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6661/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6661/BILLS-116hr6661ih.pdf |