US HB6688 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To modify the Restaurant Meals Program under the supplemental nutrition assistance program in response to COVID-19, and for other purposes.
Title
SNAP COVID–19 Anti-Hunger Restaurant Relief for You Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations. |
2020-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2020-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3697 (Same As) 2020-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB4061 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB4061 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Food assistance and relief
Food industry and services
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Food assistance and relief
Food industry and services
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6688/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6688/BILLS-116hr6688ih.pdf |