US HB6691 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community Safety and Security Act of 2018
Title
Community Safety and Security Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Handel [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-07 - House - On passage RC# 393 (Y: 247 N: 152 NV: 30 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-09-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-07 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 247 - 152, 2 Present (Roll no. 393). (text: CR H7925-7926) |
2018-09-07 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2018-09-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6691. |
2018-09-07 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6691 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. Section 2 provides that at any time on the legislative day of September 13, 2018, it shall be in order for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules as though under clause 1 of rule XV. |
2018-09-07 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1051. (consideration: CR H7925-7937) |
2018-09-06 | House | Rule H. Res. 1051 passed House. |
2018-09-05 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1051 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6691 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. Section 2 provides that at any time on the legislative day of September 13, 2018, it shall be in order for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules as though under clause 1 of rule XV. |
2018-08-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-08-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-08-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1051 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6134 (Related) 2018-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB6136 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6204 (Related) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB6134 (Related) 2018-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB6136 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6204 (Related) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Chemical and biological weapons
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Crimes against property
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Firearms and explosives
Fires
Human trafficking
Nuclear weapons
Sex offenses
Violent crime
Chemical and biological weapons
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Crimes against property
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Firearms and explosives
Fires
Human trafficking
Nuclear weapons
Sex offenses
Violent crime