US HB6718 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To place a moratorium on large concentrated animal feeding operations, to strengthen the Packers and Stockyards Act, 1921, to require country of origin labeling on beef, pork, and dairy products, and for other purposes.
Title
Farm System Reform Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2020-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3221 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Agricultural practices and innovations
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agricultural trade
Agriculture and food
Air quality
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Competition and antitrust
Department of Agriculture
Environmental health
Executive agency funding and structure
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Legal fees and court costs
Licensing and registrations
Livestock
Marketing and advertising
Meat
Pollution liability
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Agricultural practices and innovations
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agricultural trade
Agriculture and food
Air quality
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Competition and antitrust
Department of Agriculture
Environmental health
Executive agency funding and structure
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Legal fees and court costs
Licensing and registrations
Livestock
Marketing and advertising
Meat
Pollution liability
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6718/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6718/BILLS-116hr6718ih.pdf |