US HB6727 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to pay any required cost-sharing amounts for specified COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) treatment services for Medicare beneficiaries. Providers are prohibited from holding beneficiaries liable for such amounts. Additionally, the CMS may recoup amounts that would have been paid through a beneficiary's supplemental insurance from the applicable insurer, in accordance with specified procedures.
Title
To hold Medicare beneficiaries harmless for specified COVID-19 treatment services furnished under part A or part B of the Medicare program.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6674 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB4469 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6674 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB4469 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medicaid
Medicare
Military medicine
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medicaid
Medicare
Military medicine
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6727/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6727/BILLS-116hr6727ih.pdf |