US HB677 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

21st Century President Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

21st Century President Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-07-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5332)
2019-07-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 677.
2019-07-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5332-5334)
2019-07-10HouseMs. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-07-09HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 102.
2019-07-09HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-139.
2019-06-12HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-06-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-01-17HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback