US HB6804 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Onsite Wastewater Recycling Efficiency Act
Title
Onsite Wastewater Recycling Efficiency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2018-09-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2018-09-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2800 (Related) 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Licensing and registrations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
Water quality
Water use and supply
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Licensing and registrations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
Water quality
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6804/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6804/BILLS-115hr6804ih.pdf |