US HB6828 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to provide financial assistance to individuals (both citizens and nonresident aliens) and funeral homes for the funeral expenses of an individual who died of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) without sufficient insurance to pay for such expenses, through the establishment of a COVID-19 Funeral Assistance Fund. The bill requires an application for assistance to include certain information, including (1) the amount of funeral expenses incurred between January 21, 2020, and December 31, 2020, and (2) proof that COVID-19 was the direct or indirect cause of death of the deceased individual. The bill also limits assistance for funeral expenses to $10,000 for each deceased individual and prohibits FEMA from requiring residence in a presidentially-declared disaster area as a condition for receiving assistance.
Title
COVID–19 Funeral Assistance Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-05-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-05-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Cemeteries and funerals
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Family relationships
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Government trust funds
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Cemeteries and funerals
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Family relationships
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Government trust funds
Infectious and parasitic diseases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6828/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6828/BILLS-116hr6828ih.pdf |