US HB683 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires professionals employed in debt adjustment cases involving Puerto Rico to file verified statements disclosing their connections with the debtor, creditors, and other interested parties before seeking compensation for their services.
Title
PRRADA Puerto Rico Recovery Accuracy in Disclosures Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] |
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2020-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7009) |
2020-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 683. |
2020-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7009-7011) |
2020-12-08 | House | Mr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-08 | House | Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Discharged. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6975 (Related) 2020-05-22 - Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1675 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1675 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Caribbean area
Debt collection
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Law
Lawyers and legal services
Legal fees and court costs
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
Caribbean area
Debt collection
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Law
Lawyers and legal services
Legal fees and court costs
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates