US HB684 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renames the Indiana Dunes National Lakeshore as the Indiana Dunes National Park. The bill redesignates the 1.6-mile Miller-Woods Trail within the park as the Paul H. Douglas Trail.
Title
Indiana Dunes National Park Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] |
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB168 (Same As) 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HJR31 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Became Public Law No: 116-6. (TXT | PDF)
HJR31 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Became Public Law No: 116-6. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Great Lakes
Indiana
Lakes and rivers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
Indiana
Lakes and rivers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/684/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr684/BILLS-116hr684ih.pdf |